judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00885-CV
14-89-00885-CV
09/25/1989
No description available.
Crow-Centerfield, Ltd., #3
Centerfield Joint Venture
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/02/1990Case stored
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
11/03/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
10/19/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEDENIED
10/19/1989Motion for extension of time to file bondOVERRULED
10/19/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/19/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/13/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
10/12/1989Extend time to fild bond FILED - ANT,APE
09/25/1989Transcript received only; mtn. pending
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantJohn Ben Blanchard
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationPRO SEMr. Steve Peacock
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court
Harris
89-24662