judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00226-CR
09-89-00226-CR
09/25/1989
Delivery of a Drug
Baldwin, Alonzo Craig
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/23/1990Mandate Issued
03/23/1990Order EnteredDismissed
02/12/1990Letter
01/24/1990Order Entered
01/04/1990Letter
09/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
75th District Court
Liberty
Honorable Chap B. Cain
17,722
15 years - TDC