judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1296-89
PD-1296-89
09/25/1989
PDR Case Type
DAMIAN, GILBERT SANTOS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/17/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
01/17/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/01/1989REHEAR FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/26/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/19/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DAMIAN, GILBERT SANTOSApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Bill Howell
STATE OF TEXASStateJim Mapel
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00940-CR
Aff 8-3-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable J. RAY GAYLE, III
17,111