judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01149-CV
05-89-01149-CV
09/25/1989
Other Personal Injury
Ward, Aaron L. & James E. Ward
Clifford Ray Sinclair
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1997Record RetentionRetain
04/04/1991Mandate Issued
04/04/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
03/20/1991Order Entered
10/08/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/08/1990MattConv
09/10/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/10/1990Motion to Publish Opinion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/23/1990Response to Motion
08/13/1990Motion to Publish Opinion
08/13/1990Motion to Reconsider
08/13/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1990Exhibits Filed
05/31/1990Order Entered
05/16/1990Submitted
05/16/1990Submission
05/16/1990Submission
05/16/1990Submitted
03/21/1990MattConv
01/22/1990Case ready to be set
01/22/1990Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Case ready to be set
01/17/1990Response to Motion
01/08/1990Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts
01/08/1990Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
12/18/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/04/1989MattConv
09/25/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/25/1989Transcript Filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/31/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/26/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark L. Whittington
83-13528-H