judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF AUSTIN AND STATE OF TEXAS v. CAPITOL LIVESTOCK AUCTION COMPANY, INC.

Case: B-1290
B-1290
01/06/1969
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF AUSTIN AND STATE OF TEXAS
CAPITOL LIVESTOCK AUCTION COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/02/1970Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/02/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/21/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/31/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1970Response to Motion filed
04/02/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/02/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/18/1970Dissenting opinion issued.
08/18/1969Letter Filed
03/21/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/18/1969Opinion issued
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1969Response to Petition
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/06/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Capitol Livestock Auction Company, Inc.Respondent
City of Austin and State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information