judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICALIZZI (MARIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38291
Short Caption:MICALIZZI (MARIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011171Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13532
08/31/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14815
08/31/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-14816
09/06/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). No transcripts requested. 01-15062
09/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-15314
09/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-16424
10/04/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (No action required.) 01-16737
10/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16555
10/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2001. 01-16555