judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENISE C. SCOTT V. BEHAVIORAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATES INC.

Case Information: 10-AA-1465
Short Caption:DENISE C. SCOTT V. BEHAVIORAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATES INC.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01547-10Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/08/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDenise C. Scott YPro SeN
RespondentBehavioral Research Associates IncorporatedN
Donna M.P. Wilson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
11/29/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/09/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to November 29, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
12/09/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
01/04/2011APPEARANCE of Denise C. Scott as counsel for Respondent.
01/25/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript
01/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/09/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 15 days
03/14/2011RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION- to petitioner's motion for extension of time to file brief
03/24/2011RECEIVED- petitioner's brief and appendix
03/30/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix. It is F/O that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
03/30/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
03/30/2011APPENDIX
05/20/2011 It appearing that the brief of petitioner was filed with this court on March 30, 2011, and the brief of respondent was due to be filed on or before April 29, 2011, but the brief has not yet been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, or a statement that the party will not be filing a brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or statement, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on the petitioner's brief alone. (JAC)
06/02/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
06/02/2011RECEIVED- RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
06/09/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
06/09/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
06/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
06/24/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/16/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Reid, Belson
05/17/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
06/08/2012FiledMandate