judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL MAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0002)
Case Number:S-09-0002Case Docketed On:01/06/2009
Linked To: S-08-0215 , S-08-0252
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL MAY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL MAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael MayDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Nicole Georgette Krieger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 128
Citation:218 P.3d 934

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received with the Judgment and Sentence attachedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
01/06/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appeal without the Judgment and Sentence attachedOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
01/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/05/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
02/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitutionNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
04/07/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Notice of Designation of Special Assistant Attorney General for Limited Purpose and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/09/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/09/2009Order - Consolidating cases for purpose of decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal two volumes; Volume I, Original Papers and Transcripts; Volume II, Confidential File. (Record received two days late)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/19/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
10/22/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice HillOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record in S-09-0002 signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal