judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1299-89
PD-1299-89
09/25/1989
PDR Case Type
LENORE, ALAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/26/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
LENORE, ALANApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Brian D. Coyne
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00146-CR
Aff 8-24-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Donald K. Shipley
477864