judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00961-CR
01-89-00961-CR
09/25/1989
Burglary
Queen, Timothy Hugh
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/1991Mandate issued
01/03/1991Opinion issuedDismissed
01/03/1991Opinion issuedDismissed
10/18/1990Order enteredGrant motion
10/17/1990Supplemental transcript filed
10/04/1990Motion to supplement record disposedGrant motion
09/21/1990Motion to supplement record
09/13/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/13/1990Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
09/13/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/13/1990Statement of facts filed
08/31/1990Motion for leave to file
08/31/1990Motion to abate appeal
08/31/1990Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/31/1990Statement of facts filedOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
08/29/1990Motion to substitute counsel
08/09/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
06/12/1990Statement of facts filed
04/19/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
02/22/1990Brief due for retained counsel
01/18/1990Transcript filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/21/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
09/21/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantThomas Moran
StateCriminal - AppellantRandy Schaffer
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - AppellantJane C. Disko
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
511,223
40 yrs tdc