judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00962-CR
01-89-00962-CR
09/25/1989
Other Drug Possession
Rodriguez Jr., Israel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/11/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/24/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/24/1992Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
04/23/1992Case file received by higher Court or agency.
04/20/1992Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
03/03/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/14/1992Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/30/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/30/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/09/1992Motion to supplement record
12/09/1991Submission
07/22/1991Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/22/1991Case ready to be set
07/22/1991Case ready to be set
07/18/1991Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/08/1991Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/14/1991Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/30/1991Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/20/1991Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/02/1991Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/25/1991Motion strans disposedGrant motion
04/25/1991No description available.
04/17/1991Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/10/1991Motion for leave to file strans
03/28/1991Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/18/1991Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/28/1991Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
02/14/1991Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/13/1991Supplemental transcript filed
10/25/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/08/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/02/1990Case reinstatedOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
08/02/1990Court's Previous Opinion Withdrawn
08/02/1990Motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
08/02/1990Case reinstated
07/10/1990Motion for rehearing filed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/17/1990Statement of facts filed
03/01/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
01/17/1990Brief due for retained counsel
11/08/1989Transcript filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/21/1989Notice of appeal filed
09/13/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantHenry L. Burkholder III
StateCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
StatePRO SEIsmael Rodriguez
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
Honorable George H. Godwin
525,607
7 yrs tdc