judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1302-89
PD-1302-89
09/25/1989
PDR Case Type
DYER, PHILLIP WAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/29/1990BRIEF FILEDState
04/27/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/26/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/16/1990MANDATE ISSD
10/31/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
10/17/1990SUBMITTED
08/09/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
05/29/1990BRIEF FILED
04/27/1990BRIEF FILED
03/28/1990PDR DISPGranted
10/26/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/16/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dyer, Phillip WayneApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Michael Logan Ware
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00127-CR
Aff 8-3-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2
Tarrant
Honorable L. CLIFFORD DAVIS
0280482D