judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01151-CV
05-89-01151-CV
09/25/1989
Contract
Henry, Jr., W. O.
BancTexas Dallas, N. A.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
11/14/1997Record RetentionDestroy
11/12/1990Mandate Issued
11/12/1990Mandate Issued
09/12/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
09/12/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/12/1990Submission
09/12/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
09/04/1990Response to Motion
08/27/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/27/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1990Response to Motion
08/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
08/22/1990Motion for Leave to File
08/08/1990MattConv
05/25/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
05/09/1990Submission
04/26/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/25/1990Motion for Postponement
03/21/1990MattConv
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Brief Filed
01/03/1990Case ready to be set
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1990Case ready to be set
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1989Brief Filed
10/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/18/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
10/04/1989MattConv
09/25/1989Transcript Filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/20/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/31/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
87-6846-A