judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01150-CV
05-89-01150-CV
09/25/1989
Contract
Con-Real Support Group, Inc.
Mason Rich Company, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/25/1990Mandate Issued
10/25/1990Mandate Issued
10/23/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
07/13/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/13/1990MattConv
06/14/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/05/1990Response to Motion
05/29/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/14/1990Record RetentionDestroy
05/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/04/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/27/1990Response to Motion
04/24/1990Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/1990Mot Ext Time File Strans
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
04/09/1990Appearance of counselMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/1990Appearance of counsel
03/05/1990Letter Filed
02/23/1990MattConv
02/15/1990MattConv
11/17/1989Brief Filed
11/17/1989Case ready to be set
11/17/1989Case ready to be set
11/15/1989Letter Sent by the Court
11/15/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
10/26/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/25/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
10/13/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
10/02/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/25/1989Transcript Filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/01/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Glen R. Snyder
CC89-4057-B