judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00955-CV
01-89-00955-CV
09/25/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Louisiana National Bank
Jerry P. Windham
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/29/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/29/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/25/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
01/25/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
12/20/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
10/27/1989Docket statement received from party
10/27/1989Filing fee paid
10/24/1989Docket statement received from party
10/17/1989Transcript filed
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file record dispGrant motion
10/04/1989Extend time to file record
10/04/1989Filing fee paid
09/28/1989Filing fee paid
09/25/1989Extend time to file record
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantJon Miller
StateAppelleeHon. William R. Vance
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable JOHN M. DELANEY
30111-272