judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01154-CR
05-89-01154-CR
09/25/1989
Forgery
Owen, Robert Tyler
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1992Mandate Issued
01/09/1992Mandate Issued
12/23/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/14/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
04/17/1991Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
04/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/17/1991Submission
04/17/1991Submitted
04/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/17/1991Submission
04/17/1991Submitted
02/13/1991MattConv
12/17/1990Brief Filed
12/17/1990Case ready to be set
12/17/1990Case ready to be set
10/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/24/1990Brief Filed
08/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/06/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/03/1990Statement of Facts Filed
07/03/1990MattConv
03/21/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
02/16/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
02/14/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/07/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/17/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/30/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/14/1989Transcript Filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/15/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/15/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1992Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka
F88-74543-RI
25 yrs TDC