judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HISTORIC TOURS OF AMERICA V. CLARENCE SHAW

Case Information: 10-AA-1464
Short Caption:HISTORIC TOURS OF AMERICA V. CLARENCE SHAWClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02128-10Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerHistoric Tours of AmericaNPro SeN
RespondentClarence Shaw NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
11/29/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
11/29/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
12/08/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Historic Tours of America is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
01/05/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
01/05/2011DISMISSED
01/26/2011RECEIVED - Record w/transcripts.
02/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED