judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOWE (COURTNEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38292
Short Caption:LOWE (COURTNEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C111559Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13538
02/26/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Christopher R. Oram. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 02-03553
03/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. On February 26, 2002, attorney Christopher R. Oram filed a "Notice of Appearance of Counsel," informing this court that he will be counsel of record for appellant in this matter. Appellant shall comply with NRAP 9(a) and NRAP 14 within 15 days from the date of this order, and file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 120 days from the date of this order. 02-04246
03/28/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-05494
06/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 8, 2002, this court received an untimely transcript request form and the clerk requested counsel to file a motion for permission to file the late transcript request form. To date, a motion for permission has not been received. We direct the clerk of this court to file the transcript request form received on May 8, 2002. 02-10270
06/13/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/16/01. To Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 02-08045
07/05/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-11447
07/08/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. filed July 5, 2002. Pursuant to order of this court entered on March 8, 2002, the opening brief is not due to be filed until July 8, 2002. The motion is therefore denied as moot. 02-11607
07/10/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/09/02. 02-11724
07/10/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-11725
08/12/2002Order/Procedural Order. Court Recorder Kristine Cornelius shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcript for the proceedings conducted on July 16, 2001, file a motion requesting an extension of time to complete the preparation of this transcript, or notify this court in writing that the requested transcript cannot be produced. 02-13744
08/16/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-14004
09/09/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Kirstine Cornelius. She states that she never received a request for the July 16, 2001, transcript, and when she contacted counsel, Mr. Oram's secretary informed her that the transcript was no longer needed. 02-15581
09/10/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Christopher Oram regarding transcripts. 02-15636
09/13/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 14, 2002. 02-15985
10/16/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 10/15/02. 02-17949
02/14/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 12, 2002, as no transcript had been filed, this court entered an order directing court reporter Kristine Cornelius to file the requested transcript within 20 days. On September 9, 2002, this court received a letter from Ms. Cornelius stating that she never received the transcript request form. Ms. Cornelius also stated that upon receiving this court's August 12, 2002, order she called Mr. Oram's office and was informed that the requested transcript was no longer needed. On September 10, 2002, Mr. Oram submitted a letter to the clerk of this court representing that after speaking with Ms. Cornelius "it has been decided that this transcript is not necessary for this appeal." Further, Mr. Oram requests that his letter "serve as Ms. Cornelius' notification in writing that the instant transcript is no longer necessary." Because we have relied on the information contained in both letters to determine whether any transcripts should be filed in this appeal, we direct the clerk of this court to file the letters received September 9, 2002, and September 10, 2002, respectively. We remind Mr. Oram that any request for relief from this court should be made by formal motion, not by a letter addressed to the clerk of this court. We caution Mr. Oram that failure to comply with this court's procedural rules or orders in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. 03-02566
02/14/2003Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Kristine Cornelius received on September 9, 2002, pursuant to this court's order filed today. (Letter received on September 10, 2002, from Christopher Oram was previously filed.) 02-15581
04/02/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
05/01/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03-DA/RR/WM 03-07367
05/27/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-07645
05/27/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 29, 2003. 03-07645