judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00960-CR
01-89-00960-CR
09/25/1989
Robbery
Releford, Samuel James
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/21/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/20/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
07/05/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/20/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/03/1991Submitted
04/03/1991Submission
04/03/1991Submitted
02/20/1991Submission
01/03/1991Case ready to be set
01/03/1991Waiver
01/03/1991Case ready to be set
11/14/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/01/1990Letter of inquiry received, usually from an inmate.
05/24/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
03/01/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/16/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/15/1990Brief due for retained counsel
01/11/1990Statement of facts filed
11/30/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
11/16/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/15/1989Transcript filed
09/25/1989Notice of appeal filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantLarry R. Boyd
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
537,284
life