judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00454-CR
04-89-00454-CR
09/22/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Werline, Harold Gene
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/29/1991Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
07/26/1991Mandate Issued
07/26/1991Mandate Issued
07/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
06/19/1991Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/24/1991No New Event but Update in Calendar
04/19/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/11/1991Petition for Review Filed
04/03/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1991Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/13/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/13/1991Motion for Reconsideration Filed
02/09/1991Motion f/l/file Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1991Motion f/l/file Rehearing Filed
12/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/1990Submitted
10/18/1990Submission
10/18/1990Submitted
09/20/1990Submission
08/22/1990Brief Filed
08/22/1990Case ready to be set
08/22/1990Case ready to be set
08/15/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/10/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/27/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/25/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/30/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/29/1990Brief Filed
05/29/1990Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
05/03/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/23/1990No Description Available.
04/23/1990No Description Available.
04/23/1990No Description Available.
03/28/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/27/1990No Description Available.
02/16/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/07/1990No Description Available.
12/20/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/18/1989No Description Available.
11/10/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989No Description Available.
10/23/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/01/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/17/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
07/26/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
89-CR-2396-B
Life in TDC