judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01139-CR
05-89-01139-CR
09/21/1989
Other Drug Possession
Christman, Bobby Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/2019Order enteredDestroy
06/04/2002Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
12/12/1990Mandate Issued
12/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/12/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
10/12/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/16/1990Brief Filed
03/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/16/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/19/1990Brief Filed
12/20/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/15/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/07/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
11/06/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/16/1989Transcript Filed
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/2019Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
15th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd Perkins
36,845
20 yrs TDC