judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00874-CV
14-89-00874-CV
09/21/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Hutcheson, James M.
Powell, William R., Judge of the 80th Judicial District
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/28/1991Case stored
11/09/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
11/09/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/09/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/25/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
10/25/1989Submitted
10/25/1989Submission
10/25/1989Submitted
10/18/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/06/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/26/1989Order Entered
09/26/1989Order Entered
09/26/1989Order Entered
09/22/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
09/22/1989Order Entered
09/22/1989Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
09/21/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
09/21/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorDaniel J. Kasprzak
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Ray H. Potter
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Frank G. Waltermire
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorHon. David T. Maddox
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Pearson Grimes
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 80th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentS. Mitchell Glassman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJames R. Scott
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorJess Mason
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentM. David Frock
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
83-39850