judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00321-CR
08-89-00321-CR
09/21/1989
Burglary
Johnson, Michael David
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/12/1991Mandate Issued
06/12/1991Shuck purged
06/12/1991Mandate Issued
04/03/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/20/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/04/1991Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/1991Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/1991Order entered
02/20/1991Motion - extend time to file a MFR - DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/1991Miscellaneous Motion Filed
02/19/1991Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed
02/08/1991Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/11/1991Submitted
01/11/1991Submission
01/11/1991Submitted
11/29/1990Submission
09/12/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
08/27/1990Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
08/23/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
07/26/1990Miscellaneous filing
07/11/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/1990Brief Filed
06/28/1990Case ready to be set
06/28/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
06/28/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
06/28/1990Case ready to be set
06/06/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/25/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/21/1990Miscellaneous filing
02/21/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
02/21/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1990Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1990Order entered
02/20/1990Miscellaneous filing
02/09/1990Brief Filed
02/09/1990Filed waiver of oral argument
02/09/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
02/09/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/09/1990Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty filed
01/24/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/29/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/10/1989Transcript Filed
09/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/12/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - AppellantMichael David Johnson
Johnson, Michael DavidCriminal - AppellantHon. Robert Leahey
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Gary Garrison
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
Honorable Joseph Connally
C-19,809
45 yrs TDC