judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00322-CV
08-89-00322-CV
09/21/1989
Miscellaneous civil
City of El Paso, TX a Mun. Corp & City Plan Commission
Madero Development & Construction Co., Inc., a Tx Corp., &
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case sent to State Archives
01/31/1992Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
10/10/1991Mandate Issued
10/10/1991Shuck purged
10/10/1991Mandate Issued
09/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
09/25/1991Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
03/08/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/28/1991Application for Writ of Error
02/28/1991Fee paid
02/19/1991Fee paid
01/30/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/30/1991Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
01/22/1991Fee paid
01/17/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/04/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/04/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/04/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/04/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
12/21/1990Amicus Brief RECEIVED BUT NOT FILED
11/16/1990Submitted
11/16/1990Submission
11/16/1990Submitted
11/14/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/13/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
11/09/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
10/31/1990Brief Filed
10/31/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/22/1990Submission
08/01/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
06/15/1990Brief Filed
06/15/1990Case ready to be set
06/15/1990Case ready to be set
05/23/1990Brief Filed
05/23/1990Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1990Motion for leave to * filed
05/01/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
04/16/1990Sup. St. of Facts Filed
04/04/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/20/1990Sup. St. of Facts Filed
03/14/1990Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Order entered
03/14/1990Statement of Facts Filed
03/06/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
03/01/1990Exhibits Filed
03/01/1990Motion to supplement filed
03/01/1990Statement of Facts Filed
01/24/1990Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/24/1990Order entered
01/12/1990Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
12/06/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
10/04/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Transcript Filed
09/21/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. John S. Birkelbach
UnknownAppellantHon. Robert H. Freilich
UnknownAppellantHon. Eduardo Miranda
UnknownAppellantHon. Terry D. Morgan
UnknownAppelleeHon. Alejandro Acosta Jr.
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable Herb Marsh
89-443