judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00258-CR
11-89-00258-CR
09/21/1989
Probation Revocation
Hutto, David Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/1990Mandate issued
09/19/1990Case returned from higher court
09/12/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/11/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
05/03/1990Case forwarded to higher court
04/30/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
03/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/15/1990Submitted
03/15/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/08/1990Submission set in Eastland
01/15/1990Supp. brief filed
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
12/18/1989Brief filed
12/01/1989Brief filed
11/02/1989Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/06/1989Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
29th District Court
Palo Pinto
Honorable David G. Cleveland, Judge
8721
4 yrs. TDC, $400 fine