judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00879-CV
14-89-00879-CV
09/22/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Corey, Jack B.
Southern Pacific Transportation Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/12/1990Case stored
02/12/1990Mandate Issued
02/12/1990Mandate Issued
01/12/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
12/28/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/28/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/27/1989Submitted
12/27/1989Submission
12/27/1989Submitted
09/22/1989Transcript FILED
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/06/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/26/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantWilliam T. Green
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. William T. Womble
Trial Court Information
133rd District Court
Harris
Honorable LAMAR MCCORKLE
86-30538