judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00222-CV
09-89-00222-CV
09/22/1989
Workers Compensation
Ingersoll-Rand Company
Jerry Harrington
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/22/1991Mandate Issued
10/11/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/05/1991Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
05/28/1991Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
05/06/1991Petition for Writ
04/19/1991MOTION TO FILE WRIT OF MANDAMUS GRANTEDMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1991Motion to File Writ Filed
03/21/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/15/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/28/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1990Submitted
10/25/1990Submission
10/02/1990Letter
08/02/1990Submission
04/16/1990Brief Filed
04/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/14/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/01/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/28/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1989Brief Filed
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/17/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/22/1989Transcript Filed
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ingersoll-rand CompanyAppellantArthur R. Almquist
Jerry HarringtonAppelleeRichard J. Clarkson
Joseph C. Blanks
Trial Court Information
60th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
B-119,184