judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00883-CR
14-89-00883-CR
09/22/1989
Other Felony
Wolf, Dwight
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/23/1990Case stored
10/11/1990Mandate Issued
10/11/1990Mandate Issued
09/24/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/07/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/23/1990Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/22/1990Submitted
08/22/1990Submission
08/22/1990Submitted
08/09/1990Hearing Record FILED
05/10/1990Order Entered
05/03/1990Motion to Expedite Appeal DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
05/03/1990Mtn.withdraw as attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE,DENIED
04/18/1990Motion to Expedite Appeal FILED-ANT,APE,APP
04/18/1990Mtn.withdraw as attorney FILED-ANT,APE
03/22/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
03/13/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
02/27/1990No description available.
01/18/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/11/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/02/1990No description available.
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/25/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/16/1989No description available.
09/22/1989Transcript FILED
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/11/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/15/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRichard L. Senasac
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Peter C. Speers, III
Trial Court Information
155th District Court
Waller
6157
10 years Prob./$2000 fine