judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROMINE (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38293
Short Caption:ROMINE (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31246 , 35237 , 38127 , 38471 , 39378 , 43391
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141926Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13540
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38065/38267/38293/38311/38333/38359. 01-17801
01/18/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 02-01322
01/18/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn24[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-15340
10/01/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15402
10/01/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 3, 2002. 02-15402