Case Heading (S-09-0004) | |||||
Case Number: | S-09-0004 | Case Docketed On: | 01/07/2009 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Sheridan County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | R. MARK ARMSTRONG v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY | ||||
Full Title: | R. MARK ARMSTRONG, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, Appellee (Petitioner). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | R. Mark Armstrong | Pro Se |
Appellee | Department of Environmental Quality | Bruce A. Salzburg John William Renneisen Thomas W. Rumpke Patricia Lyn Bach |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/07/2009 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/07/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/07/2009 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
01/07/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/23/2009 | Motion - Dismiss - involuntary | Motion | Dismiss - involuntary | Final | |
01/23/2009 | Memorandum - In support of motion | Memorandum | In support of motion | Final | |
01/23/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to dismiss appeal; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/23/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Memorandum of law in support of appellee's motion to dismiss appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/26/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index from district court clerk. | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
02/10/2009 | Order - Dismiss - involuntary | Order | Dismiss - involuntary | Final | |
02/26/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |