judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

PROVIDENCE INSTITUTION FOR SAVINGS v. W. J. SIMS, DBA LONE STAR MILL AND ROBIE LOVE, CONSTABLE PRECINCT NO. 1, DALLAS COUNTY

Case: B-1292
B-1292
01/06/1969
Application for Writ of Error
PROVIDENCE INSTITUTION FOR SAVINGS
W. J. SIMS, DBA LONE STAR MILL AND ROBIE LOVE, CONSTABLE PRECINCT NO. 1, DALLAS COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/14/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/21/1969Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent
01/16/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/14/1969Opinion issued
04/14/1969Reply to Response
03/21/1969Amended Response to Petition for Review filed
03/21/1969Motion for Leave to File Amended Brief filed
02/12/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/16/1969Response to Petition
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/06/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Providence Institution for SavingsPetitioner
W. J. Sims, dba Lone Star Mill and Robie Love, Constable Precinct No. 1, Dallas CountyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information