judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00457-CV
04-89-00457-CV
09/22/1989
Divorce
Norma Vela
Juan Jose Vela
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/26/1989Mandate Issued
12/26/1989Mandate Issued
11/10/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Verification Filed
10/31/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/22/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/22/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/24/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/26/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
79th Judicial District Court
Brooks
Honorable Terry A. Canales
4414
n/a