judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00462-CV
04-89-00462-CV
09/22/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Employment Commission
United Day School of Laredo, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/29/1990Mandate Issued
01/29/1990Mandate Issued
12/15/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/15/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/15/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/28/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/24/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/28/1989No Description Available.
09/27/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/05/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
111th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Antonio Zardenetta
38,777
n/a