judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00953-CV
01-89-00953-CV
09/22/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Enterprise Products Company
Energy Plant Constructors, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/1991Mandate issued
10/22/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
10/16/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/05/1991Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
04/29/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
04/19/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
04/12/1991Writ filed
04/12/1991Writ filed
03/14/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/26/1991Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
02/26/1991Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
02/08/1991Motion for rehearing filed
01/24/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/24/1991Opinion issuedOverruled
01/04/1991Motion for rehearing filed
12/20/1990Court's Previous Opinion Withdrawn
12/20/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/20/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/20/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/20/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/18/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/18/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/31/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/23/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/15/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearingGrant motion
08/03/1990Motion for rehearing filed
07/31/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
07/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/04/1990Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
04/27/1990Supplemental brief filed
04/12/1990Supplemental brief filed
03/28/1990Submission
02/21/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/21/1990Case ready to be set
02/21/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/22/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/18/1990Supplemental transcript filed
01/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/28/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
12/22/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/15/1989Motion for leave to file strans
11/22/1989Statement of facts filed
10/26/1989Filing fee paid
09/22/1989Transcript filed
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/15/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantBradley M. Whalen
StateAppellantE. John Gorman
StateAppellantHon. Darrell E. Reed, Jr.
StateAppelleeHon. William M. Coats
StateAppellantRonald J. Restrepo
StateAppellantLynne Liberato
StateAppelleeRichard F. Greenleaf
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
81-31537