Case Information: 38294 | |||
Short Caption: | OCHOA (ARTURO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 31819 , 38503 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138354 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/09/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/09/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-13546 | |
11/06/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Based upon the documents submitted in this appeal, it appears that this is an appeal from an order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. fn1[We construe the notice of appeal as being from the district court's order denying the petition.] It appears that appellant was represented by William J. Taylor during the lower court proceedings. Therefore, Mr. Taylor is hereby ordered to comply with NRAP 3C and within 10 days from the date of this order, file on behalf of this appellant a transcript request form in compliance with NRAP 3C, or a certificate stating that no transcript is required and shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 01-18511 | |
12/17/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-21221 | |
01/04/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed December 17, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 02-00194 | |
01/09/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to file Fast Track Statement and Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-00622 | |
01/30/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed January 9, 2002. These appeals are consolidated for appellate purposes. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days within which to file and serve a single fast track statement and appendix for these appeals. Nos. 38294/38503. (02-01973) | 02-01973 | |
02/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-02272 | |
02/08/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On February 4, 2002 counsel filed a motion requesting an extension of time untile February 15, 2002 to file the fast track statement in these appeals. On January 30, 2002 this court ordered counsel to file the fast track statement on or before February 19, 2002. The motion is therefore denied as moot. Nos. 38294/38503 | 02-02583 | |
02/21/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 15 Page Fast Track Statement. Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-03354 | |
02/21/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (For Motion to file 15 page Fast Track Statement and Fast Track Statement.) Due date: 10 days. Nos. 38294/38503. | ||
02/21/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days. Nos. 38294/38503. | ||
03/11/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-04327 | |
03/12/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. To date, appellant has failed to file proof of service of the February 21, 2002, motion. In the interest of judicial efficiency and cause having been shown, we grant the motion. The clerk shall file the 15-page fast track statement received on February 21, 2002. We admonish counsel for appellant for failing to comply with the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure or the notice issued on February 21, 2002. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track response. Nos. 38294/38503. (02-04426) | 02-04426 | |
03/12/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-03355 | |
03/22/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service pursuant to NRAP 25(d) (for appellant's appendix). Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-05144 | |
03/22/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service pursuant to NRAP 25(d) (for fast track statement). Nos. 38294/38503. | 02-05145 | |
04/03/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Nos. 38294/38503 | 02-05926 | |
04/03/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. (Filed in 38294 only.) Nos. 38294/38503 | 02-05928 | |
08/22/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[This appeal was previously consolidated with Docket No. 38503. Upon further review, we have discovered a jurisdictional defect. We elect to address these appeals separately.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-14427 | |
09/18/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-14931 | |
09/18/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/30/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 20, 2002. | 02-14931 |