judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENISE L. ANDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0005)
Case Number:S-09-0005Case Docketed On:01/07/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DENISE L. ANDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DENISE L. ANDERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDenise L. AndersonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 119
Citation:216 P.3d 1143 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/24/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/14/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/22/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/19/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal