judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEONARD YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1476
Short Caption:LEONARD YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16485-08Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeonard Young Y
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ann K. H. SimonNN
John P. MannarinoYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas T. Heslep, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas T. Heslep, Esquire
01/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 3, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so.(Castillo)
02/01/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
02/01/2011RECEIVED - state re transcript.
02/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
02/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (162 pgs/Zamora) 9/21/10 proc.
02/17/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (377 pgs/Johnson) 9/22-24/10 proc. w/cd
03/01/2011RECORD INDEX
03/01/2011RECORD COPIES
03/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (juror certification - SEALED)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/31/2011APPENDIX
04/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. (JAC)
05/25/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/25/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/22/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/30/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/05/2012FiledMemorandum of substition of counsel, Atty Mannarino will argue in place of Atty Simon (Appellee)
01/10/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Beckwith,Reid Thomas T.Heslep Esq.,for Appellant John P.Mannarino Esq.,for Appellee
04/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Beckwith, Associate Judge, and reid, Senior Judge.)
05/22/2012FiledMandate