judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-89-00116-CR
06-89-00116-CR
09/21/1989
Other Drug Delivery
Hardemon, Tommy Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/1990Mandate issued
09/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/1990Submitted
09/18/1990Submission
09/07/1990Brief Filed
09/07/1990Case ready to be set
08/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/10/1990Case ready to be set
07/16/1990LETTER
06/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/31/1990Holding for Record
05/31/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/31/1990Brief Filed
03/08/1990Letter re late appellant's brief
01/24/1990Letter re late appellant's brief
01/12/1990Letter re late appellant's brief
10/20/1989Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/13/1989Holding for Record
08/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
196th District Court
Hunt
Honorable E. Paul Banner
15,409
25 years TDC