judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00452-CR
04-89-00452-CR
09/21/1989
Robbery
Evans, Johnny Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/1991Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
10/17/1991Mandate Issued
10/17/1991Mandate Issued
10/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
09/11/1991Higher Court DecisionRefused
06/06/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/17/1991Petition for Review Filed
04/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
08/31/1990Case ready to be set
08/31/1990Brief Filed
08/31/1990Case ready to be set
08/20/1990Brief Filed
07/20/1990No Description Available.
05/07/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
04/26/1990Motion Filed
03/28/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990No Description Available.
10/30/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/27/1989No Description Available.
10/09/1989No Description Available.
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/23/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1991Case StoredCase stored
10/17/2016RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
89-CR-1324
12 years TDC