judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9063
C-9063
09/18/1989
App Writ of Error
KAREN ROBERTS ET AL.
THE FIRST STATE BANK OF STRATFORD TEXAS ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/02/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/16/2005Order of the Court Issued
07/31/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
06/20/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied(ORDER OF 12-13-89 WAS TODAY W/D AS BEING IMPROVIDENTLY GRANTED.)
06/20/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.
05/28/1990Cost letter issuedF/$75 FEE ON GRANTING APP.
01/31/1990Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY J. BRUCE TEICHMAN ARGUED FOR RESP BY J. R. LOVELL
12/13/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.15/15-5 MINUTES.
12/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling granted(THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN AS IMPROVIDENT GRANT ON 6/20/90 AND APP DENIED.)
12/13/1989Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
10/05/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/05/1989No description available.
10/02/1989Reply to Response
09/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/31/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PATSY J. MILLERRespondentMs. Cynthia A. Quetsch
COLE UMPHRESSPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
LAURA UMPHRESSPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OFRespondentMr. Louis T. Dubuque
HARDY COFFMANPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
JENNIFER UMPHRESSPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
PEGGY TATERespondentMs. Peggy Jo Tate
HOMER TED COFFMANRespondentMs. Cynthia A. Quetsch
THOMAS PERRY COFFMANRespondentMr. Thomas Perry Coffman
DEON COFFMANPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
CLAYTON UMPHRESSPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
M. JOYCE BROOKSRespondentMs. Cynthia A. Quetsch
DIRKSON LEE UMPHRESSPetitionerMr. J. Bruce Teichman
BARBARA BOULDINRespondentMs. Cynthia A. Quetsch
FRANCIS STEVENSRespondentMs. Cynthia A. Quetsch
Court of Appeals Information:
07-89-00002-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
774 SW2d 415, 07-13-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
69th District Court
Sherman
Honorable Bill H. Sheehan
2803