judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1270-89
PD-1270-89
09/18/1989
PDR Case Type
MATHYS, BILLY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/12/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
01/31/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/29/1989REHEAR FILED
12/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/12/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/18/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/02/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
MATHYS, BILLYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Stanley G. Schneider
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00617-CR
Aff 7-13-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
497227