judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00255-CR
11-89-00255-CR
09/15/1989
Probation Revocation
Hallock, Allen Everett
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/1990Mandate issued
08/23/1990Opinion issuedReversed
03/15/1990Submitted
03/15/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/08/1990Submission set in Eastland
01/04/1990Brief filed
01/04/1990Case ready to be set
01/04/1990Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Brief received
12/26/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
11/30/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/24/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
11/02/1989Brief filed
10/23/1989Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
104th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Billy John Edwards, Senior Judge
9505-B
6 month jail