judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00254-CR
11-89-00254-CR
09/15/1989
Other Felony
Glaze, Louis Nicholas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1989Mandate issued
11/09/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
11/06/1989Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
10/16/1989Inquiring on status, etc. of case
10/16/1989Inquiring on status, etc. of case
10/04/1989TR filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court
Taylor
Honorable Donald Lane, Judge
16,077-A
7 Years TDC