judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00861-CV
14-89-00861-CV
09/15/1989
Contract
Thompson, George Cornelius
Baker Boyer National Bank, N.A.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/12/1990Mandate Issued
11/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/12/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
09/27/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS MODIFIED
09/27/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS MODIFIED
09/20/1990Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
09/13/1990Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
09/11/1990Submitted
09/11/1990Submission
09/11/1990Submitted
09/06/1990Mtn.withdraw as attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE,DENIED
08/29/1990Mtn.withdraw as attorney FILED-ANT,APE
08/10/1990Submission
06/12/1990Mtn.to reschedule oral argu.DISPOSED - ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
06/12/1990Mtn.to reschedule oral argu.FILED - ANT,APE,STA
05/14/1990Submission
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/21/1989Suggestion for Remittitur FILEDTAKEN WITH THE CASE
12/06/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/06/1989Suggestion for Remittitur FILED
11/15/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/26/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/15/1989Transcript FILED
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Samuel B. Collins
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantEmmett Sterling Huff
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
85-38438