judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00241-CV
12-89-00241-CV
09/15/1989
Other Personal Injury
Middlebrooks, Gary L., and wife, Janet E.
Allstate Insurance Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
05/30/1991Letter from the Court
03/18/1991Letter from the Court
01/08/1991No Description Available.
12/12/1990Mandate Issued
11/27/1990
11/12/1990
10/26/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
09/26/1990
09/26/1990Submission
03/05/1990
02/23/1990Brief Filed
02/23/1990Case ready to be set
02/01/1990Brief Filed
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/19/1989Response to Motion Filed
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/14/1989
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Surety Bond Filed
07/18/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
05/23/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Middlebrooks, Gary L.& Janet EAppellantMr. Dean White
Allstate Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. Jeff D. Fudge
Trial Court Information
294th District Court
Van Zandt
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
86-651