judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00859-CV
14-89-00859-CV
09/15/1989
Contract
Dhanani, Zulfikarali K. and Nathoo, Riyaz P.
Shah, Jayant Bhimshi
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/11/1991Case stored
05/28/1991Mandate Issued
05/28/1991Mandate Issued
05/13/1991Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
03/05/1991Writ of Error FILED
02/25/1991Writ of Error FILED
02/18/1991No description available.GRANTED
02/11/1991No description available.
01/10/1991Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
01/07/1991Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
12/20/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/20/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
12/14/1990Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE
12/03/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
11/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
09/20/1990Submission
03/05/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/05/1990Case ready to be set
03/05/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/09/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/20/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/17/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/18/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/28/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/15/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/15/1989Transcript FILED
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/16/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/19/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJames T. Lombardino
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLori A. Pritchett
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Brenda A. Schram
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantBrock C. Akers
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantDavid Cooney
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
85-37499