judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00867-CV
14-89-00867-CV
09/18/1989
Contract
Southern Pacific Transportation Company
All Diesel Power, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/12/1990Case stored
08/13/1990Mandate Issued
08/13/1990Mandate Issued
07/13/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/18/1990Submitted
06/18/1990Submission
06/18/1990Submitted
06/15/1990Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
05/14/1990Submission
12/28/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STAGRANTED
12/11/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
12/04/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/20/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/19/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
09/18/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/18/1989Transcript FILED
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/25/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/22/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantCaren E. Walker
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeLes Cochran
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
87-48038