judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANFORD (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33473
Short Caption:SANFORD (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR950080Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/05/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/15/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/15/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00385
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33356, 33363, 33364, 33439, 33454, 33473. 99-00316
08/05/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/05/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-07223
03/08/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly dismissed appellant's petition. Briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-04229
04/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04352
04/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2001. 01-04352