judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHAWN PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1509
Short Caption:SHAWN PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL3656-04Filed Date:12/01/2010

Opening Event Date:12/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/19/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShawn A. Phillips YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 1, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (No Appendix attached). (Served by: DCCA on 1/13/11).
01/26/2011AFFIDAVIT of Truth from Appellant.
03/02/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on January 11, 2011, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before February 15, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
03/16/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
03/16/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to motion) (USAO was served)
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (USAO served)
04/14/2011ORDERED: That appellant's motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged limited appendix. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's otion for the appointment of counsel is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
04/14/2011APPENDIX - limited
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/12/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance; (LODGED) OPPO
07/18/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
09/08/2011FiledAffirmed
09/26/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Served by: DCCA on 9/26/11) (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se pet for rehearing en banc
12/19/2011FiledMandate