judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9057
C-9057
09/15/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
THE FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK
THE HONORABLE SIDNEY C. FARRAR JR. JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/19/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/09/1990Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
11/08/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
09/25/1989Relator's reply brief
09/19/1989No description available.
09/19/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
09/15/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/15/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/09/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
G. A. MOSITES CO.RespondentMr. Daniel W. McDonald
Court of Appeals Information:
02-89-00191-CV
Denied
___ SW2d ___, 08-21-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable JOHN G. HILL
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
153-111276-88